VA HB2346 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial hemp. Expands the existing industrial hemp registration program to include a person growing or processing industrial hemp for any purpose. The bill expands the existing definition of "hemp product," redefines "industrial hemp" to include any part of the plant Cannabis sativa L. with a delta-9-tetrahydrocannabinol concentration of not more than 0.3 percent on a dry weight basis, and excludes from the definition of marijuana any industrial hemp as so defined.
Title
Industrial hemp; expands existing registration program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100368D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 2 | 4112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |