VA HB2347 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Small Business Investment Grant Fund; recapture of awards. Provides that if an eligible investor is awarded a grant from the Small Business Investment Grant Fund and the small business in which the investment was made (i) relocates outside of the Commonwealth within two years of the award of the grant or (ii) closes within two years of the award of the grant as a result of a criminal conviction on the part of any officer, director, manager, or general partner of such business relating to his involvement with the business, such investor shall forfeit the grant and refund such moneys to the Virginia Small Business Financing Authority. The bill also advances the starting date for an eligible investor to receive a grant from July 1, 2016, to July 1, 2019, and advances the end date for receiving such a grant from January 1, 2019, to January 1, 2022.
Title
Small Business Investment Grant Fund; recapture of awards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0035) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 35 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2347ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102988D-E |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2347E |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102988D |