VA HB2365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special assessment for land preservation; optional limit on annual increase in assessed value. Authorizes localities that require use value assessment and taxation to provide by ordinance that the annual increase in the assessed value of eligible property shall not exceed a specified dollar amount per acre.
Title
Land preservation; special assessment, optional limit on annual increase in assessed value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0022) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 22 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2365ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 19100985D-E |
2019-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2365E |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100985D |