VA HB2370 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Possession and consumption of marijuana; penalty. Decriminalizes simple marijuana possession and provides a civil penalty of no more than $250. Current law imposes a maximum fine of $500 and a maximum 30-day jail sentence for a first offense, and subsequent offenses are a Class 1 misdemeanor. But the bill provides that any person who knowingly or intentionally smokes, consumes, or otherwise ingests marijuana in a public place or while driving or operating a motor vehicle, engine, train, watercraft, or motorboat is guilty of a misdemeanor and shall be confined in jail not more than 30 days and fined not more than $500, either or both, and subsequent convictions are punished as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also provides that the suspended sentence/substance abuse screening provisions and driver's license suspension provisions apply only to criminal violations or to civil violations by a juvenile. A civil violation will be treated as a conviction for prohibitions on the purchase or transport of a handgun and disqualification for a concealed handgun permit.
Title
Marijuana; possession and consumption, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104173D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 273 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 250.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 250.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 254 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 188.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |