VA HB2375 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adoption of zoning ordinance. Provides that if a local governing body reduces the time period by which a planning commission shall review a proposed zoning ordinance amendment to less than 100 days, the governing body shall hold at least one public hearing on the proposed reduction of the commission's review period and publish notice of such public hearing in a newspaper having general circulation in the locality at least two weeks prior to the public hearing date and publish the notice on the locality's website, if one exists.
Title
Zoning ordinance; review of proposed amendments.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0483) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 483 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2375ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Passed House (95-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102117D-E |
2019-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2375E |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-18 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102117D |