VA HB2380 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; online course catalogue; no-cost and low-cost course materials. Requires the registrar or another appropriate employee of each public institution of higher education to identify conspicuously in the online course catalogue or registration system, as soon as practicable after the necessary information becomes available, each course for which the instructor exclusively uses no-cost course materials or low-cost course materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; online course catalogue, no-cost/low-cost course materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 590 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2380ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Higher Education
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19100710D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2380E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100710D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2380
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2380+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2380E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2380ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0590+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0903V0021+HB2380
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0081+HB2380
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2162+HB2380
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2236+HB2380
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0268+HB2380
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2380+HB2380
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2380+HB2380

Bill Comments

feedback