VA HB2387 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Student discipline; alternative education programs. Requires local school boards to provide alternative education programs for suspended students and assign licensed instructional personnel for such programs in a manner that produces divisionwide ratios of students in average daily membership to full-time equivalent teaching positions that are not greater than 10 to one. The bill also requires the Board of Education to establish quality standards for such alternative education programs. The bill provides that the above-mentioned provisions shall become effective after the rebenchmarking of direct aid to the public education budget for the 2020-2022 biennium.
Title
Student discipline; alternative education programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (17-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102969D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 276.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.04 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |