VA HB2388 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for in-state tuition; certain individuals. Declares eligible for in-state tuition any individual who meets certain eligibility criteria and who has filed an application for permanent residency or asylum or is under the age of 27 and is the child of an individual who has filed an application for asylum. The bill provides that any such individual shall remain eligible for in-state tuition for as long as he maintains continuous enrollment in the public institution of higher education and such application has not been denied. The bill also prohibits any student who became eligible for in-state tuition as a result of his lawful presence in the United States pursuant to approval under the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals program or any other federal deferred action program from being deemed ineligible for in-state tuition by virtue of the elimination or modification of any such program.
Title
In-state tuition; eligibility for certain individuals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education (16-Y 5-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102521D |