VA HB2391 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Landfills; waste disposal fee; Greenhouse Gas Fund. Requires any person owning or operating a permitted solid waste management facility to collect from each person disposing waste at such facility a fee of $1 for every 500 pounds of waste, or fraction thereof in excess of 500 pounds, that is accepted. The bill allows the facility's owner or operator to retain 10 percent of the fees collected for administrative expenses and requires the facility's owner or operator to remit the remainder on a quarterly basis to the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) for deposition in the Greenhouse Gas Fund (the Fund), created by the bill. The bill provides that the Director of the Department shall, after considering recommendations from the Solid Waste Management Board (the Board), expend moneys in the Fund on promoting the reduction in the emission of greenhouse gases in the Commonwealth, including methane and other gases that are emitted from landfills, and on supporting efforts to counter the effects of climate change. The bill provides that five percent of the Fund may be spent on administrative expenses and authorizes the Board to promulgate and enforce regulations necessary to carry out the provisions of the bill.
Title
Landfills; waste disposal fee, deposits into the Greenhouse Gas Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102536D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1408.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 1425.40 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |