VA HB2395 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hazardous Waste Site Inventory. Requires the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) to compile by July 1, 2020, to update at least annually thereafter, and to post to its website a Hazardous Waste Site Inventory (the Inventory). The Inventory shall be a current listing of sites permitted by or in corrective action under the Department at which the disposal of hazardous waste not otherwise excluded from regulation has occurred, providing specific information about each site.
Title
Hazardous Waste Site Inventory; DEQ to compile and update at least annually.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: BY FOR THE DAY (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2019-02-24 | House | No further action taken |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: BY FOR THE DAY (51-Y 49-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day (51-Y 49-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Pending question ordered |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19102542D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2395E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102542D |