VA HB2397 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for TANF; drug-related felonies. Provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) shall not be denied assistance solely because he has been convicted of a felony offense of possession of a controlled substance, provided that he complies with all obligations imposed by the court and the Department of Social Services and is actively engaged in or has completed a substance abuse treatment program.
Title
TANF; eligibility, drug-related felonies.
Sponsors
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] |
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (49-Y 48-N) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (49-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to (49-Y 48-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106344D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106344D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (18-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Reconsidered by HWI subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102526D |