VA HB2411 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; reinstating pre-Affordable Care Act provisions. Repeals provisions that were added, and restores provisions that were amended or repealed, by the General Assembly since 2011 in efforts to bring the laws of the Commonwealth in conformity with requirements of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act. The measure will become effective on the later of July 1, 2017, or the effective date of federal legislation repealing the Act.
Title
Health insurance; reinstating pre-Affordable Care Act provisions.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (8-Y 4-N) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 33-N) (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2411ER) |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 32-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (65-Y 32-N) |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (8-Y 4-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (64-Y 33-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 33-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17104106D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2411E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (15-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2017-01-19 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17104106D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1 | 137.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 137.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 276.9:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 352 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 316.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 326 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3406.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3407.18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3411.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3412.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3414 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3414.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3417 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3418.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3430.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3430.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3431 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3432.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3432.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3432.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3433.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3436 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3438 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3454.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3455 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3500 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3521.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3522.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3523.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3540.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3541 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3541.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3551 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3556 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 3571 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4216.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4217 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4229.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4312.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 4509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 508.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 508.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 5900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 5901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 2 | 5901.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 2501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |