VA HB2413 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Multi-jurisdiction grand jury; secrecy of information. Provides that any person granted permission to make notes and to duplicate portions of the evidence given before the multi-jurisdiction grand jury shall maintain the secrecy of all information obtained from a review or duplication of the evidence presented to the multi-jurisdiction grand jury, except for disclosure as he deems necessary for use in a criminal investigation or proceeding. The bill also provides that after a person has been indicted by a grand jury, the attorney for the Commonwealth shall notify such person that the multi-jurisdiction grand jury was used to obtain evidence for a prosecution. As introduced, the bill was a recommendation of the Virginia Criminal Justice Conference.
Title
Multi-jurisdiction grand jury; secrecy of information.
Sponsors
Del. Les Adams [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0522) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 522 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2413ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102055D |