VA HB2415 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Business records electronically registered on a blockchain self-authenticating. Creates a rebuttable presumption that a business record electronically registered on a blockchain is a self-authenticating document for certain facts. The bill provides that such presumption does not extend to the truthfulness, validity, or legal status of the contents of the fact or record. This bill is a recommendation of the Joint Commission on Technology and Science.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business records; electronically registered on a blockchain self-authenticating document.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103576D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801390.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback