VA HB2425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Department of Health; monitoring of health care-associated infections. Requires health care facilities that are required to report information about health care-associated infections (HAIs) to the National Healthcare Safety Network (NHSN) to release such data to the Board of Health through the NHSN.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, Virginia Department of; monitoring of health care-associated infections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0293)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 293 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2425ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2425H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106226D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106226D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRereferred to Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-30HouseMotion to rerefer to committee agreed to
2019-01-29HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103795D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32135.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2425
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2425+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2425H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2425ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0293+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0016+HB2425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0041+HB2425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0092+HB2425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2326+HB2425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0275+HB2425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2425+HB2425
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2425+HB2425

Bill Comments

feedback