VA HB2426 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-05 - Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Dispensing of controlled substances; advance disclosure of charge. Requires every person licensed to dispense controlled substances to provide to the patient for whom such controlled substance is dispensed, or to the patient's authorized representative, an estimate of the payment amount for which the patient will be responsible, prior to dispensing such controlled substance.
Title
Dispensing of controlled substances; advance disclosure of charge.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Tabled in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103258D |