VA HB2429 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Preliminary protective orders; hearing dates. Allows the full hearing resulting from the issuance of a preliminary protective order to be heard on the same hearing or trial date as a related criminal offense if such hearing or trial date has already been set for a date later than 15 days after the issuance of the preliminary protective order. Current law requires that a full hearing be held within 15 days of the issuance of a preliminary protective order in every instance.
Title
Preliminary protective orders; hearing dates.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103367D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 152.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |