VA HB2431 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

My Virginia Plan Program; multiple employer plan for My Virginia Plan Program; multiple employer plan for private employers and their employees. Establishes the My Virginia Plan Board (the Board) and directs the Board to create the My Virginia Plan Program (the Program) to allow employees of private employers in the Commonwealth to contribute to a defined contribution retirement plan overseen by the Board. The bill requires all self-employed individuals, sole proprietors, and nongovernmental employers to allow their employees to participate in the Program, but exempts such employers from doing so if they offer a substitute retirement plan, defined in the bill. The bill authorizes the Board to contract

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

My Virginia Plan Program; multiple employer plan for private employers and their employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103883D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222491(n/a)See Bill Text
222499(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback