VA HB2432 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
My Virginia Plan Program; retirement plans for employees of My Virginia Plan Program; retirement plans for employees of private employers. Establishes the My Virginia Plan Board (the Board) and directs the Board to create the My Virginia Plan Program (the Program) to enable private employers to connect with financial services firms that offer retirement plans. The bill directs the Board to contract with a private entity
Title
My Virginia Plan Program; establishes My Virginia Plan Board, creates Fund.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102874D |