VA HB2437 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic toll collection device monthly statements; fees. Prohibits the Department of Transportation from charging monthly fees in connection with online monthly account statements for electronic toll collection devices.
Title
Electronic toll collection devices; monthly statements, fees.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102911D |