VA HB2442 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Local collection fees. Provides that an ordinance for collection of overdue accounts may also provide for the imposition of collection and administrative fees, not to exceed the amount provided for in ยง 58.1-3958.
Title
Collection fees, local; an ordinance for collection of overdue accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-04-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017 | |
2017-04-05 | House | Communicated to Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2442ER) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 1-N) |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 17103934D |