VA HB2445 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Death certificates; medical certification; electronic filing. Requires the completed medical certification portion of a death certificate to be filed electronically with the State Registrar of Vital Records through the Electronic Death Registration System and provides that, except under certain circumstances, failure to file a medical certification of death electronically through the Electronic Death Registration System shall constitute grounds for disciplinary action by the Board of Medicine. The bill includes a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020, and a phased-in requirement for registration with the Electronic Death Registration System and electronic filing of medical certifications of death for various categories of health care providers. The bill directs the Department of Health to work with stakeholders to educate and encourage physicians, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners to timely register with and utilize the Electronic Death Registration System. Death certificates; medical certification; electronic filing. Requires the completed medical certification portion of a death certificate to be filed electronically with the State Registrar of Vital Records through the Electronic Death Registration System and provides that, except under certain circumstances, failure to file a medical certification of death electronically through the Electronic Death Registration System shall constitute grounds for disciplinary action by the Board of Medicine. The bill includes a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020, and a phased-in requirement for registration with the Electronic Death Registration System and electronic filing of medical certifications of death for various categories of health care providers. The bill directs the Department of Health to work with stakeholders to educate and encourage physicians, physician assistants, and nurse practitioners to timely register with and utilize the Electronic Death Registration System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Death certificate; medical certification, electronic filing w/State Registrar of Vital Records, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0213)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 213 (effective - see bill)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2445ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2445H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105355D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105355D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102122D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321263(n/a)See Bill Text
5412915(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2445
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2445+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2445H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2445ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0213+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1203V0012+HB2445
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0042+HB2445
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1988+HB2445
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2034+HB2445
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0195+HB2445
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2445+HB2445
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2445+HB2445

Bill Comments

feedback