VA HB2449 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Scholastic records; disclosure of directory information. Provides that a school or institution of higher education may disclose certain directory information of a student to certain internal persons for educational purposes or internal business if the student has not opted out of such disclosure. Under current law, such disclosures require written consent. The bill also provides an exception for state and federal law requirements from the prohibition of such disclosures.
Title
Scholastic records; disclosure of directory information.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0229) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 229 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2449ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2449H1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105277D-H1 |
2019-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105277D-H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104013D |