VA HB2457 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Practitioners of medicine, osteopathy, podiatry, or chiropractic; retiree license. Provides that the Board of Medicine may issue a retiree license to any doctor of medicine, osteopathy, podiatry, or chiropractic who holds an active, unrestricted license to practice in the Commonwealth upon receipt of a request and submission of the required fee. The bill provides that a person to whom a retiree license has been issued shall not be required to meet continuing competency requirements for the first biennial renewal of such license. The bill also provides that a person to whom a retiree license has been issued shall only engage in the practice of medicine, osteopathy, podiatry, or chiropractic for the purpose of providing charity care or health care services to patients in their residence for whom travel is a barrier to receiving health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicine, osteopathy, podiatry, or chiropractic, practitioners of; inactive license, charity care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0379)
2019-03-14 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 379 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2457ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2457H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105633D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105633D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103907D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412937.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2457
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2457+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2457H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2457ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0379+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1201V0010+HB2457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0052+HB2457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2166+HB2457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2240+HB2457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0289+HB2457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2457+HB2457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2457+HB2457
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3067+HB2457

Bill Comments

feedback