VA HB2458 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Early childhood care and education; licensing. Requires Early childhood care and education; licensing. Requires the Board of Education to establish a statewide unified public-private system for early childhood care and education in the Commonwealth to be administered by the Board of Education, the Superintendent of Public Instruction, and the Department of Education. The bill transfers the authority to license and regulate child day programs and other early child care agencies from the Board of Social Services and Department of Social Services to the Board of Education and the Department of Education. The bill maintains current licensure, background check, and other requirements of such programs. The bill establishes the Early Childhood Innovation Fund for the purpose of facilitating regional public-private collaboration and to field test innovative strategies and evidence-based practices that support a robust system of comprehensive early childhood care and education services to deliver measurable school readiness outcomes and meet regional workforce support needs. Such provisions of the bill
Title
Early childhood care and education; establishment, licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105282D-H1 |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102705D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 2292 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 2824 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 741 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 370.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 370.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1167 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 199.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 289.054 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 296.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 299.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.18:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 341.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
51 | 1 | 617 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1515 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1701.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1704.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1715 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1716 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1720.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1721.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1722 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1723 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1724 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1725 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1727 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1734 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1738 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1809.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1810 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1812 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1813 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 1815 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 914 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |