VA HB2468 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation to study State Route 28; report. Directs the Department of Transportation to study the feasibility of implementing improvements to State Route 28 between U.S. Route 15 in Fauquier County and State Route 29 in Fairfax County.
Title
State Route 28; Department of Transportation to study.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102971D |