VA HB2469 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility regulation; pilot program for Electric utility regulation; pilot program for undergrounding electrical transmission lines. Provides that the State Corporation Commission's approval of a proposed transmission line for inclusion in a pilot program established as part of the "Grid Transformation and Security Act" enacted in 2018 (i) precludes the placement of future overhead electrical transmission lines of at least 69 kilovolts in the same area or corridor by other transmission projects and (ii) does not preclude the placement of electrical distribution lines in the same area or corridor. The pilot program provides for the underground construction of two electrical transmission lines, including one for the Haymarket transmission line project in Prince William County.
Title
Electric utility regulation; pilot program for undergrounding electrical transmission lines.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 7-N) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104386D |