VA HB2471 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; admissions applications; criminal history. Prohibits each public institution of higher education from (i) utilizing an institution-specific admissions application that contains questions about the criminal history of the applicant or (ii) denying admission to any applicant on the basis of any criminal history information provided by the applicant on any third-party admissions application accepted by the institution.
Title
Higher educational institutions, public; admissions applications, criminal history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102945D |