VA HB2472 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Hate crimes; gender, disability, gender identity, or sexual orientation; penalty. Adds gender, disability, gender identity, and sexual orientation to the categories of victims whose intentional selection for a hate crime involving assault, assault and battery, or trespass for the purpose of damaging another's property results in a higher criminal penalty for the offense. The bill also adds gender, disability, gender identity, and sexual orientation to the categories of hate crimes that are to be reported to the central repository of information regarding hate crimes maintained by the Virginia State Police and provides that a person who is subjected to acts of intimidation or harassment, violence directed against his person, or vandalism to his real or personal property, where such acts are motivated by gender, disability, gender identity, and sexual orientation, may bring a civil action to recover his damages. The bill also provides that no provider or user of an interactive computer service on the Internet shall be liable for any action voluntarily taken by it in good faith to restrict access to material that the provider or user considers to be intended to incite hatred on the basis of gender, disability, gender identity, or sexual orientation.
Title
Hate crimes; adds gender, disability, gender identity, or sexual orientation, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] |
Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100498D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 121 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 57 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 42.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 49.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |