VA HB2476 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Public institutions of higher education; tuition and mandatory fees. Declares the governing board of any public institution of higher education for which the average increase in the amount of undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees over the most recent 10-academic-year period exceeds the average increase in the amount of undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees over such period across each public institution of higher education ineligible to increase undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees for the subsequent academic year. The bill permits each other public institution of higher education to increase undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees for the subsequent academic year by a certain percentage, but prohibits any such percentage increase from exceeding the following product: the annual percentage increase in the average Consumer Price Index for all items, all urban consumers (CPI-U), as published by the Bureau of Labor Statistics of the U.S. Department of Labor, from January 1 through December 31 of the year immediately preceding the relevant academic year, multiplied by a certain factor that is based on the size of the increase in the undergraduate tuition and mandatory fees over the most recent 10-academic-year period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher educational institutions, public; tuition and mandatory fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseReported from Education (17-Y 3-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102212D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311301(n/a)See Bill Text
231307(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback