VA HB2477 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; licensed retail suppliers. Provides that customers of an incumbent electric utility that is required to obtain capacity for all load and expected load growth in its service area shall, if they purchase energy from a supplier licensed to sell retail electric energy within the Commonwealth, continue to pay their incumbent electric utility for the non-fuel generation capacity and transmission related costs incurred by the incumbent electric utility in order to meet such customers' capacity obligations. The measure provides that the advance written notice period applicable to such customers shall be three years. The measure does not apply to customers of licensed suppliers that had an agreement with a licensed supplier entered into before February 1, 2019, or had aggregation petitions pending before the State Corporation Commission prior to January 1, 2019, unless and until such a customer has returned to its incumbent electric utility.The measure requires each licensed retail supplier serving customers of Appalachian Power to file annual reports with the Commission and provides that the failure to do so constitutes grounds for suspension or revocation of its license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; licensed retail suppliers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 38-N) (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0833)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 833 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2477ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-25HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2477ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 38-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (58-Y 38-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19105704D-EH1
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB2477EH1
2019-02-04HouseAmendments by Delegate Kilgore agreed to
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105704D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105704D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 2-N)
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104210D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2477
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2477+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2477H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2477EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2477ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2477ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0833+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0073+HB2477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2481+HB2477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0156+HB2477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2477+HB2477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0744HB2477+HB2477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3393+HB2477
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1175HB2477+HB2477

Bill Comments

feedback