VA HB2479 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm transfers; criminal history record information Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks; penalty. Requires a background check for any firearm transfer and directs the Department of State Police (the Department) to establish a process for transferors to obtain such a check from licensed firearms dealers. A transferor who sells a firearm to another person without obtaining the required background check is guilty of a Class 6 felony. The bill also provides that a transferee who receives a firearm from another person without obtaining the required background check is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts transfers (i) between immediate family members; (ii) that occur by operation of law; (iii) by the executor or administrator of an estate or by the trustee of a testamentary trust; (iv) at firearms shows in accordance with law; (v) that are part of a buy-back or give-back program; (vi) of antique firearms; (vii) that occur at a shooting range, shooting gallery, or any other area designed for the purpose of target shooting or for use during target practice, a firearms safety or training course or class, a shooting competition, or any similar lawful activity; or (viii) that are temporary transfers that (a) occur within the continuous presence of the owner of the firearm or (b) are necessary to prevent imminent death or great bodily harm. The bill removes the provision that makes background checks of prospective purchasers or transferees at firearms shows voluntary. The bill also provides that the Department shall have three business days to complete a criminal history record information check before a firearm
Title
Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Richard Sullivan [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103834D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.07 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4201.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |