VA HB2490 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Tech Talent Investment Program. Creates a grant program to assist qualified public institutions of higher education, defined in the bill, in reaching, by 2039, a goal of increasing by at least 25,000 degrees the number of bachelor's and master's degrees awarded in computer science, computer engineering, and closely related fields, or that otherwise align with traded-sector, technology-focused growth opportunities identified by the Virginia Economic Development Partnership Authority. To be eligible for an annual grant, a qualified institution is required to enter into a memorandum of understanding setting forth specific criteria for eligible degrees, eligible expenses, degree production goals, and graduation rates. Failure to meet criteria would result in the adjustment of future awards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tech Talent Investment Program and Fund; created, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N) (Y: 4 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0638)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 638 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2490ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107704D-H2
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Ruff, Saslaw, Dunnavant
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Rush, Jones, S.C., Sickles
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (4-Y 94-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106603D-S1 (4-Y 94-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2490S1
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106603D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106603D-S1
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 5-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (92-Y 5-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2490H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105488D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105488D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseAssigned App. sub: Special Subcommittee on Amazon
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102503D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311239(n/a)See Bill Text
2311242(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2490
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2490+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2490H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2490S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2490H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2490ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0638+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0209V0002+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0043+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2500+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0361+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2490+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2490+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3069+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0858HB2490+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1086HB2490+HB2490
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3335+HB2490

Bill Comments

feedback