VA HB2494 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; dissemination of information concerning religious preferences and affiliations. Prohibits any state agency maintaining an information system that includes personal information from disseminating to federal government authorities information concerning the religious preferences and affiliations of data subjects for the purpose of compiling a list, registry, or database of individuals based on religious affiliation, national origin, or ethnicity, unless specifically required by state or federal law. This prohibition applies even if consent is given to disseminate such information to public institutions of higher education, state facilities under Title 37.2 (Behavioral Health and Developmental Services), and juvenile correctional facilities established pursuant to Title 66 (Juvenile Justice) or Chapter 11 (?§16.1-226 et seq.) of Title 16.1 (Juvenile and Domestic Relations District Courts). As introduced, this bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Freedom of Information Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Government Data Collection and Dissemination Practices Act; religious preferences and affiliations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0774)
2019-03-22 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 774 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2494ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 1-N)
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19100283D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2494E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from General Laws with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100283D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223803(n/a)See Bill Text
231402(n/a)See Bill Text
372712(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2494
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2494+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2494E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2494ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0774+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1104V0016+HB2494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0100+HB2494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2388+HB2494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0157+HB2494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2494+HB2494
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0902HB2494+HB2494

Bill Comments

feedback