VA HB2495 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced Shipbuilding Training Facility Grant Program. Revises the Advanced Shipbuilding Training Facility Grant Program by allowing the Commonwealth, the eligible city, and the qualified shipbuilder to structure an agreement whereby the eligible city would receive grants, not to exceed $42 million, to be used toward payment of the costs of building the Facility, and the qualified shipbuilder, upon fulfilling performance requirements, would gain ownership of the facility at the end of the grant period. These parties retain the authority under current law to structure an agreement whereby the qualified shipbuilder receives grants upon fulfilling performance requirements. The bill also changes the date by which a memorandum of understanding must be reached to qualify a shipbuilder for the Program, from June 30, 2009, to August 31, 2011.
Title
Advanced Shipbuilding Training Facility Grant Program; revises Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N 3-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0749) | |
2011-03-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 749 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2495ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 11105396D-S1 (95-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB2495S1 | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Houck agreed to | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105396D-S1 | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105396D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (11-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N 3-A) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 0-N 3-A) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Printed as engrossed 11103906D-E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB2495E | |
2011-02-07 | House: Amendments by Delegate Jones agreed to | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2011-01-27 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-27 | House: Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote | |
2011-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2011-01-21 | House: Presented and ordered printed 11103906D |