VA HB2495 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Fall cankerworm; spraying prohibited during certain months. Prohibits localities from spraying pesticides intended to suppress an infestation of the fall cankerworm during the period between March 1 and August 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fall cankerworm; spraying prohibited during certain months.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 4-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104098D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522403(n/a)See Bill Text
152926.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback