VA HB2500 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utilities; mandatory renewable energy portfolio standard. Replaces the existing voluntary renewable energy portfolio standard program with a mandatory renewable portfolio standard program that requires each investor-owned electric utility to generate or purchase, from facilities in the Commonwealth, increasing percentages of electric power that is generated from qualifying renewable sources. The required percentages start at a minimum of 20 percent of the total electric energy sold in 2020. The required percentages increase in steps until 2027; in that year and thereafter, at least 80 percent of the total electric energy sold is required to be generated from qualifying renewable sources. A utility that fails to comply with an RPS standard established for a year is required to pay a compliance fee of 10 cents for each kilowatt-hour by which it failed to meet the standard.
Title
Electric utilities; mandatory renewable energy portfolio standard.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 7-N) (Y: 1 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (1-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100534D |