VA HB2503 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; transactions with affiliates; fuel procurement arrangements. Requires the State Corporation Commission to conduct a formal hearing before approving any changes to fuel procurement arrangements between affiliates of an electric utility or its parent company that will impact rate payers. The measure requires that the Commission, before approving any transaction or act with an affiliated interest, find that it is in the public interest. The measure also requires that Commission hearings on a public utility's transactions with an affiliate be formal hearings held after notice and opportunity to be heard. Currently the Commission may conduct informal hearings on such petitions. Finally, the measure requires that any contract or arrangement for fuel, materials, funding, or services to be provided directly or indirectly to a utility by an affiliate be filed with the Commission and made available to the public for review without restrictions.
Title
Public utilities; transactions with affiliates, fuel procurement arrangements.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102307D |