VA HB2505 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Environmental Quality; stormwater regulations; Tennessee River Basin. Directs the Department of Environmental Quality to adopt regulations to permit, regulate, and control stormwater runoff in the Tennessee River Basin that are no more stringent than those regulations already adopted for the regulation of stormwater runoff into other waters of the Commonwealth.
Title
Environmental Quality, Department of; stormwater regulations, Tennessee River Basin.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103979D |