VA HB2507 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Office of the Attorney General; FOIA Ombudsman; powers and duties; report. Requires the Attorney General to appoint a Virginia Freedom of Information Act Ombudsman (Ombudsman) to promote compliance by state agencies with the provisions of the Virginia Freedom of Information Act (FOIA). The bill outlines the powers and duties of the Ombudsman and provides for the Ombudsman to submit by November 30 of each year a report on his activities and policy recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Attorney General, Office of the; FOIA Ombudsman appointed, powers and duties, report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N) (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in General Laws
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee failed to recommend reporting (2-Y 4-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103994D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22501.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback