VA HB2508 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local school boards; support services positions; behavior analysts. Includes licensed behavior analysts and licensed assistant behavior analysts as support services positions in a local school division for the purposes of Title 22.1 (Education) of the Code of Virginia.
Title
Support services positions; includes licensed behavior analysts, etc., in local school division.
Sponsors
Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102461D |