VA HB2516 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance rate reviews; minimum anticipated loss ratios; pharmacy benefit price spread. Requires the State Corporation Commission (Commission) to treat the price spread on any contract between the issuer of a health benefit plan and its pharmacy benefits manager as an administrative cost of the issuer. The measure requires the issuer's administrative costs to be excluded from the amount of benefits provided under a health benefit plan when the Commission determines the health benefit plan's anticipated loss ratio. The measure codifies portions of the Commission's regulations promulgated to implement the requirement that it review and approve the premium rates for health benefit plans, including the requirement that the benefits provided by a health benefit plan are reasonable in relation to the premiums charged.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance rate reviews; pharmacy benefit price spread.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Commerce and Labor
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 1-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102959D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
382316.2(n/a)See Bill Text
3824214(n/a)See Bill Text
3824319(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback