VA HB2521 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Social Services; regulations governing assisted living facilities; staffing during overnight hours. Directs the Board of Social Services to amend regulations governing staffing of assisted living facility units with residents who have serious cognitive impairment due to a primary psychiatric diagnosis of dementia and are unable to recognize danger or protect their own safety and welfare to require that the following number of direct care staff members be awake and on duty during overnight hours: (i) when 22 or fewer residents are present, at least two direct care staff members; (ii) when 23 to 32 residents are present, at least three direct care staff members; (iii) when 33 to 40 residents are present, at least four direct care staff members; and (iv) when more than 40 residents are present, at least four direct care staff members plus at least one additional direct care staff member for every 10 residents or portion thereof in excess of 40 residents. This bill is identical to SB 1410.
Title
Assisted living facilities; staffing during overnight hours.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Chris Head [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2521ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2521H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104765D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104765D-H1 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103897D |