VA HB2524 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nonpayment of wages; private action. Provides that an employee has a private cause of action against an employer who fails to pay wages. The measure provides that if the court finds that the employer knowingly failed to pay the wages, it shall also award the employee reasonable attorney fees and other costs. If the court finds that the employer's failure to pay wages was willful and with intent to defraud the employee, the court shall award the employee reasonable attorney fees and other costs plus an additional sum equal to treble the amount of wages due.
Title
Nonpayment of wages; private action.
Sponsors
Del. Ronnie Campbell [R] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (11-Y 7-N) (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-04 | House | Motion to refer to committee agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (11-Y 7-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102364D |