VA HB2533 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Small business parental leave tax credit. Creates an Small business parental leave tax credit. Creates an income tax credit for taxable year 2021 for a portion of the salary or wages paid by small businesses to full-time employees while on leave for the birth or adoption of a child. The credit equals 65 percent of the first $8,333 in salary and wages paid by the small business to an employee while on parental leave, which must be leave taken that is separate from any paid vacation, sick, or
Title
Small businesses; parental leave tax credit.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Finance |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102246D |