VA HB2539 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sunset date for worker retraining tax credit; worker training investment tax credit. Advances the sunset date of the worker retraining tax credit from January 1, 2022, to January 1, 2019, and creates the worker training investment tax credit to replace it beginning with taxable year 2019. The worker training investment tax credit is a modification of the worker retraining tax credit. Credit is allowed to businesses who provide (i) eligible worker training, defined in the bill, or (ii) manufacturing instruction to students. The provisions relating to manufacturing instruction are identical to those in the expiring worker retraining tax credit.
Title
Worker retraining tax credit; sunset date, worker training investment tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 5-N) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 5-N) (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 189 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2539ER) |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (89-Y 5-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 9-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102343D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 439.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 439.6:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |