VA HB2540 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales and use tax; reduced rate on essential personal hygiene products. Applies the reduced state sales and use tax rate of 1.5%, which under current law applies only to food purchased for human consumption, to essential personal hygiene products, defined in the bill as (i) nondurable incontinence products such as diapers, disposable undergarments, pads, and bed sheets; and (ii) menstrual cups and pads, pantyliners, sanitary napkins, tampons, and other products used to absorb or contain menstrual flow. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2020. This bill is identical to SB 1715.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; reduced rate on essential personal hygiene products.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] | Del. Ronnie Campbell [R] | Sen. Chris Head [R] | Del. Timothy Hugo [R] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Sen. John McGuire [R] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] | Del. Robert Thomas [R] |
Del. Thomas Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) (Y: 0 N: 94 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0549) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 549 (effective 1/1/20) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2540ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senators: Howell, Dunnavant, Boysko |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Delegates: Byron, Ransone, Kory |
2019-02-13 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-13 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 94-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 94-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 19100843D-E |
2019-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2540E |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-28 | House | Reported from Finance with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100843D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 603.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 603.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 604.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 611.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |