VA HB2541 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance; Broadband Advisory Council; expiration. Extends the expiration of the Office of Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2021. The bill also repeals the expiration of the Broadband Advisory Council, and alters and expands from 14 to 17 its total membership. This bill is identical to SB 1618.
Title
Telework Promotion and Broadband Assistance, Office of, and Broadband Advisory Council; expiration.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Science and Technology with amendments (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0709) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 709 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2541ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 19106718D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2541S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106718D-S1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106718D-S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 19100848D-E |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2541E |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Science and Technology with amendments (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Science and Technology |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100848D |