VA HB2545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Governor's secretaries; Secretary of Workforce Development created. Creates in the Governor's cabinet the position of Secretary of Workforce Development (the Secretary). The bill removes the position of Chief Workforce Development Advisor and reassigns that position's responsibilities to the Secretary.
Title
Workforce Development, Secretary of; created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105769D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104057D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 234 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2471 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2471.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2472 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2472.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 435.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |