VA HB2546 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Maternal Death Review Team established. Establishes the Maternal Death Review Team (the Team) to develop and implement procedures to ensure that maternal deaths occurring in the Commonwealth are analyzed in a systematic way. The bill requires the Team to (i) develop and revise as necessary operating procedures for maternal death reviews, including identification of cases to be reviewed and procedures for coordinating among the agencies and professionals involved; (ii) improve the identification of, and data collection and record keeping related to, causes of maternal deaths; (iii) recommend components of programs to increase awareness and prevention of, and education about, maternal deaths; and (iv) recommend training to improve the review of maternal deaths. The bill also requires the Team to compile triennial statistical data regarding maternal deaths and to make such data available to the Governor and the General Assembly. The bill provides that information and records obtained or created by the Team and portions of meetings of the Team at which individual maternal deaths are discussed shall be confidential.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maternal Mortality Review Team; established, investigations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
2019-04-03HouseEnacted, Chapter 834 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-04-03SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled bill text (HB2546ER2)
2019-04-03HouseReenrolled
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2019-04-03SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-26HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2546ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2019-02-07SenateRereferred from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2546H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105204D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105204D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102443D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223705.5(n/a)See Bill Text
223711(n/a)See Bill Text
321373(n/a)See Bill Text
321374(n/a)See Bill Text
321375(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2546
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2546+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2546H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2546ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2546ER2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0834+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1202V0015+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0072+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0205V0022+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0059+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2484+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0238+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0277+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2546+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2546+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3395+HB2546
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1176HB2546+HB2546

Bill Comments

feedback